电子邮件 | jam***@***.se | 获取Email |
---|
电子邮件 | jam***@***.se | 获取Email |
---|
Öhman is a family owned financial group. The Group consists of a core stake in Nordnet, which is the group's largest financial commitment, asset management firm Öhman Fonder managing 129 billion SEK (2022-12-31) along with a number of investments. Today Tom Dinkelspiel is Chairman of the Board and Johan Malm is Managing Director of the Group.
公司 | Öhman |
---|---|
职位 | CEO & Chief Investment Officer |
地点 | Sweden |
http://www.linkedin.com/in/jamalabida | |
部门 | c_suite,master_finance |
头衔 | CEO & Chief Investment Officer Öhman Fonder |
Öhman CEO & Chief Investment Officer
2019-08-01 -
Öhman Chief Investment Officer
2016-01-01 -
DNB Asset Management (International) Head of Asset Allocation
2014-11-01 - 2015-12-01
DNB Asset Management (International) Portfolio Manager Asset Allocation
2011-06-01 - 2014-11-01
Första AP-fonden (AP1) Senior Portfolio Manager Alternative Investments & GTAA
2006-01-01 - 2011-05-01
Jamal Norling 在 Öhman 担任 CEO & Chief Investment Officer Öhman Fonder
Jamal Norling 在 Öhman 的职位是 CEO & Chief Investment Officer Öhman Fonder
Jamal Norling 的电子邮件地址是 jam***@***.se
Jamal Norling 的电话号码是 -
Jamal Norling 的公司电话号码是 +468****
Jamal Norling 在 financial services 工作。
Jamal Norling 的一些同事包括Adriane Seggelen、Jimi Sundberg、Peter Rydell、Lars FesteAnna Henebratt、。
Jamal Norling联系方式: 电子邮件地址:jam***@***.se 电话号码:-
Jamal Norling 的个人领英是:http://www.linkedin.com/in/jamalabida
Jamal Norling 的办公地点:Mäster Samuelsgatan 6, 2 tr, Stockholm, SE
全球B2B企业库
海关贸易数据
展销采购数据
Top-ranked on G2 Crowd