电子邮件 | lar***@***.se | 获取Email |
---|
电子邮件 | lar***@***.se | 获取Email |
---|
Öhman is a family owned financial group. The Group consists of a core stake in Nordnet, which is the group's largest financial commitment, asset management firm Öhman Fonder managing 129 billion SEK (2022-12-31) along with a number of investments. Today Tom Dinkelspiel is Chairman of the Board and Johan Malm is Managing Director of the Group.
公司 | Öhman |
---|---|
职位 | Head of Fixed Income |
地点 | Sweden |
http://www.linkedin.com/in/lars-kristian-feste-b455117 | |
部门 | |
头衔 | Head of Fixed Income at Öhman |
Öhman Head of Fixed Income
2017-06-01 -
Öhman Head of Rates
2016-01-01 - 2017-06-01
DNB Asset Management Head of Fixed Income Sweden
2010-08-01 - 2015-12-01
DNB Asset Management Portfolio Manager
2007-06-01 - 2010-08-01
DNB Asset Management Portfolio Manager
2005-01-01 - 2007-01-01
Lars Feste 在 Öhman 担任 Head of Fixed Income at Öhman
Lars Feste 在 Öhman 的职位是 Head of Fixed Income at Öhman
Lars Feste 的电子邮件地址是 lar***@***.se
Lars Feste 的电话号码是 -
Lars Feste 的公司电话号码是 +468****
Lars Feste 在 financial services 工作。
Lars Feste 的一些同事包括Adriane Seggelen、Jimi Sundberg、Peter Rydell、Lars FesteAnna Henebratt、。
Lars Feste联系方式: 电子邮件地址:lar***@***.se 电话号码:-
Lars Feste 的个人领英是:http://www.linkedin.com/in/lars-kristian-feste-b455117
Lars Feste 的办公地点:Mäster Samuelsgatan 6, 2 tr, Stockholm, SE
全球B2B企业库
海关贸易数据
展销采购数据
Top-ranked on G2 Crowd