电子邮件 | mma***@***.cz | 获取Email |
---|
电子邮件 | mma***@***.cz | 获取Email |
---|
EKOVA ELECTRIC proceeds with maintenance, modernization and production of trams.
公司 | ŠKODA EKOVA a.s. |
---|---|
职位 | Chief Executive Officer |
地点 | Czech Republic |
http://www.linkedin.com/in/miroslavmares | |
部门 | c_suite |
头衔 | Chief Executive Officer at ŠKODA EKOVA, a.s. |
ŠKODA EKOVA a.s. Chief Executive Officer
2021-08-01 -
Plant Manager
2015-04-01 - 2019-04-01
Hanon Systems Plant Manager
2010-01-01 - 2015-03-01
Amphenol-Tuchel Electronics GmbH Plant Manager Automotive
2003-02-01 - 2008-12-01
OSRAM Production Manager
2000-09-01 - 2003-02-01
Miroslav Mares 在 ŠKODA EKOVA a.s. 担任 Chief Executive Officer at ŠKODA EKOVA, a.s.
Miroslav Mares 在 ŠKODA EKOVA a.s. 的职位是 Chief Executive Officer at ŠKODA EKOVA, a.s.
Miroslav Mares 的电子邮件地址是 mma***@***.cz
Miroslav Mares 的电话号码是 -
Miroslav Mares 的公司电话号码是 -
Miroslav Mares 在 railroad manufacture 工作。
Miroslav Mares 的一些同事包括Martin Bednarz、Jan Gutovsky、Miroslav Mares、Vlasta PlackovaJarmila Filipova、。
Miroslav Mares联系方式: 电子邮件地址:mma***@***.cz 电话号码:-
Miroslav Mares 的个人领英是:http://www.linkedin.com/in/miroslavmares
Miroslav Mares 的办公地点:Martinovská 3244/42, Ostrava, 723 00, CZ
Top-ranked on G2 Crowd
全球B2B企业库 海关贸易数据 展会采购数据
全球B2B企业库
海关贸易数据
展销采购数据
Top-ranked on G2 Crowd