电子邮件 | rde***@***.***.au | 获取Email |
---|
电子邮件 | rde***@***.***.au | 获取Email |
---|
Eagers' origins trace back to 1913 when Edward Eager and his son, Frederic, founded their family automotive business, E.G. Eager & Son Ltd, which continues today as a wholly-owned subsidiary of Eagers Automotive Limited. After establishing the first motor vehicle assembly plant in Queensland in 1922, the business secured the distributorship of General Motors' products in Queensland and northern New South Wales in 1930 and listed as a public company in 1957 under the name Eagers Holdings Limited. A merger in 1992 with the listed A.P. Group Limited saw the addition of a number of new franchises and our name change to A.P. Eagers Limited. Further new franchises and geographic diversification followed. In 2019 we celebrated the amalgamation of AP Eagers Limited (APE) and Automotive Holdings Group (AHG) coming together to become one connected entity now named Eagers Automotive Limited – and as a result have entered into our next chapter with a sense of purpose and as a stronger, and united team striving toward our shared common goal of success. With the merger in 2019 with AHG, Eagers Automotive has grown substantially to be the number one automotive group in Australia which includes significant presence in every state and additional locations within New Zealand. EA has commenced the design phase for our automotive retailing and mobility hub which will be set on over 90000m2 of land in Brisbane Airport's new $300 million BNE Auto Mall. The Automall precinct will provide a world-class automotive retailing experience for our customers of the future. By investing in world leading projects like the Brisbane Auto Mall and race track precinct set to launch in 2023 will catapult us to the next level of automotive retailing.
公司 | Eagers Automotive Limited |
---|---|
职位 | Head of Finance Operations |
地点 | Australia |
http://www.linkedin.com/in/robbie-deotto-09b8159b | |
部门 | master_finance,master_operations |
头衔 | Head of Finance Operations |
Eagers Automotive Limited Head of Finance Operations
2022-12-01 -
Chief Operating Officer
2022-01-01 - 2022-11-01
AMA Group Ltd Corporate Financial Controller
2021-07-01 - 2021-12-01
Frizelle Sunshine Automotive Group Financial Controller
2011-07-01 - 2021-06-01
Frizelle Sunshine Automotive Group Accountant
2005-03-01 - 2011-06-01
Robbie Deotto 在 Eagers Automotive Limited 担任 Head of Finance Operations
Robbie Deotto 在 Eagers Automotive Limited 的职位是 Head of Finance Operations
Robbie Deotto 的电子邮件地址是 rde***@***.***.au
Robbie Deotto 的电话号码是 -
Robbie Deotto 的公司电话号码是 -
Robbie Deotto 在 retail 工作。
Robbie Deotto 的一些同事包括Craig Kime、Jason Kohlhagen、Adam Preece、Gabrielle VlokAngela Travers、。
Robbie Deotto联系方式: 电子邮件地址:rde***@***.***.au 电话号码:-
Robbie Deotto 的个人领英是:http://www.linkedin.com/in/robbie-deotto-09b8159b
Robbie Deotto 的办公地点:Hub A Level 1 56 Edmondstone Road, Bowen Hills, Queensland 4006, AU
全球B2B企业库
海关贸易数据
展销采购数据
Top-ranked on G2 Crowd