电子邮件 | ema***@***.com | 获取Email |
---|
电子邮件 | ema***@***.com | 获取Email |
---|
John Morris Scientific Pty Ltd was founded in 1952 by John Wyzenbeek. Since then, the company has expanded with offices and service centers located in Sydney Melbourne, Brisbane, Perth and Auckland, as well regional sales hubs in Adelaide, Cairns, Canberra and Dunedin. Along the way, John Morris has established strong and long-lasting relationships with the world's leading providers of scientific and test & measurement equipment. Companies such as Gilson, Memmert, CEM, Sigma, Parr, Fritsch, Julabo, MTS, PCB, Stanhope Seta, Teledyne ISCO, PAC, Ankom and Advanced Instruments (among many others) that are synonymous with quality and innovation choose to work with John Morris. Our team regularly attend factory held training sessions both to learn about new product technologies and also to further our technical service & maintenance capabilities. Our team is available to attend customers facilities to help develop the best solution. We have in-house NATA certified pipette calibration facilities, and all operations are certified to ISO9001. As a result of our long standing commitment to quality and service, we are proud to have been able to support Australia's and New Zealand's leading scientific and industrial organisations as they undertake key research and development that make a genuine difference both locally and globally. For over 70 years & three generations, John Morris has remained privately owned and provided a stable and reliable platform for our customers, partners and team.
公司 | John Morris Group |
---|---|
职位 | Senior Executive - Service Admin |
地点 | Sri Lanka |
http://www.linkedin.com/in/shabbeer-mubarak-362b58150 | |
部门 | |
头衔 | Operations Manager at Supreme trading company |
John Morris Group Senior Executive - Service Admin
2020-08-01 -
Assistant Manager Sales & Administration
2014-11-01 - 2019-11-01
JAYKAY MARKETING SERVICES (PVT.) LIMITED Retail Outlet Executive (Contractual Basis)
2013-09-01 - 2014-10-01
Senior Operations Executive
2012-08-01 - 2013-09-01
Sales Officer
2008-12-01 - 2012-08-01
Shabbeer Mubarak 在 John Morris Group 担任 Operations Manager at Supreme trading company
Shabbeer Mubarak 在 John Morris Group 的职位是 Operations Manager at Supreme trading company
Shabbeer Mubarak 的电子邮件地址是 ema***@***.com
Shabbeer Mubarak 的电话号码是 -
Shabbeer Mubarak 的公司电话号码是 -
Shabbeer Mubarak 在 research 工作。
Shabbeer Mubarak 的一些同事包括Helen Greedy、Pippa Newstead、Bob Maconachie、Billam PoulierOmer Shabbir、。
Shabbeer Mubarak联系方式: 电子邮件地址:ema***@***.com 电话号码:-
Shabbeer Mubarak 的个人领英是:http://www.linkedin.com/in/shabbeer-mubarak-362b58150
Shabbeer Mubarak 的办公地点:61 - 63 victoria avenue chatswood, chatswood, new south wales, australia
Top-ranked on G2 Crowd
全球B2B企业库 海关贸易数据 展会采购数据
全球B2B企业库
海关贸易数据
展销采购数据
Top-ranked on G2 Crowd